This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/04/2022 at 09:25:22 (UTC).

ALLEN DERMESROPYAN vs. BALKAN EXPRESS, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 ALLEN DERMESROPYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BALKAN EXPRESS, LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are PARKER, TONYA and PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7265

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

PARKER, TONYA

PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DERMESROPYAN, ALLEN

Defendants

BALKAN EXPRESS, LLC

413 Chalet Dr.

Crowley, TX 76036

GARCIA, RICARDO

Worth, TX 76123

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THORSON, PAUL D

Defendant Attorney

INGRAM, T. GLENN

 

Court Documents

MAILED TO T. GLENN INGRAM

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED COPY OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJIJDICE TO ALL PARTIES

MAILED TO PAUL D THORSON

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED COPY OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJIJDICE TO ALL PARTIES

MOTION FOR DISMISSAL

MOTION - DISMISS

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: SCOTT FARLEY, D.O.

TEXAS HEALTH PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL OF DALLAS - MEDICAL PERTAINING - ALLEN DERMESROPYAN

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: TEXAS HEALTH PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL OF DALLAS - MEDICAL PERTAINING - ALLEN DERMESROPYAN

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - CLEVELAND EMERGENCY HOSPITAL BILLING RE: LA'TEA BELL

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: CLEVELAND EMERGENCY HOSPITAL - BILLING RE: LA'TEA BELL

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: PREFERRED OPEN MRI, LTD.

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER - MEDICAL

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS - CITY OF MESQUITE - EMS

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS - CITY OF MESQUITE - EMS

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: Initial Trial Setting (Level 3)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED COPY OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJIJDICE TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: PARKER, TONYA; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; DERMESROPYAN, ALLEN: Awarded Against:; BALKAN EXPRESS, LLC, et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: CITY OF MESQUITE - EMS - BILLING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: SCOTT FARLEY, D.O.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: TEXAS HEALTH PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL OF DALLAS - MEDICAL PERTAINING - ALLEN DERMESROPYAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: PREFERRED OPEN MRI, LTD. - RADIOLOGY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: CLEVELAND EMERGENCY HOSPITAL - BILLING RE: LA'TEA BELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - BALKAN EXPRESS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION: RICARDO GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 12/18/2020; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 12/18/2020: Comment; BALKAN EXPRESS, LLC,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 12/14/2020; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 12/14/2020: Comment; RICARDO GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for DERMESROPYAN, ALLEN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 73302-2020-DCLK; DERMESROPYAN, ALLEN $308.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for DERMESROPYAN, ALLEN : Transaction Assessment; ; $308.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: DERMESROPYAN, ALLEN ; Total Financial Assessment $308.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $308.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less