This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/05/2022 at 23:10:20 (UTC).

AIM ASSOCIATION INSURANCE MANAGEMENT, INC. vs. ONEBEACON INSURANCE GROUP, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 AIM ASSOCIATION INSURANCE MANAGEMENT, INC filed an Other lawsuit against ONEBEACON INSURANCE GROUP, LLC,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are PARKER, TONYA and PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5189

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

PARKER, TONYA

PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AIM ASSOCIATION INSURANCE MANAGEMENT, INC.

Defendants

LAMORAK COMPANY

BEDIVERE INSURANCE COMPANY

ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

HOMELAND INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK

COMPASS BANK

ONEBEACON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

ONE BEACON INSURANCE COMPANY

THE EMPLOYERS' FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

OBI NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

ONEBEACON INSURANCE GROUP, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOLBROOK, JOSEPH ALLEN

PHANEUF, CARRIE JOHNSON

Defendant Attorney

SCHERZ, CARL C

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Application for TRO and Te

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

AIM ASSOCIATION INSURANCE MANAGEMENT, INC. - WRIT

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: RETURN OF SERVICE OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION ON AIM ASSOCIATION INSURANCE MANAGEMENT INC.

AIM_-_Prop_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Re-Open.pdf

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: Proposed Order

Aim__order_dissolving_temporary_injunction.pdf

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

TheOneBeaconDefendantsResponsetoPlfsAppforTROandTI.pdf

RESPONSE; Comment: TO APPL FOR TRO & TEMP INJ

DC1515189 CIT B.pdf

CITATION ISSUED

COMPASS BANK - WRIT OF INJUNCTION

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: RETURN OF SERVICE OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION ON COMPASS BANK

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; PARKER, TONYA; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

LAMORAK COMPANY - CITATION

LAMORAK COMPANY - CITATION

THE EMPLOYERS' FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY - CITATION

THE EMPLOYERS' FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY - CITATION

ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - CITATION

ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - CITATION

OBI NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY - CITATION

OBI NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY - CITATION

BEDIVERE INSURANCE COMPANY - CITATION

BEDIVERE INSURANCE COMPANY - CITATION

ORDER - DISSOLVE

ORDER - DISSOLVE

ORDER - REINSTATE (OCA and REOPEN CASE)

ORDER - REINSTATE (OCA and REOPEN CASE)

AIM_-_Prop_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Re-Open.pdf

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: Proposed Order

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISSOLVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2016
  • DocketNOTE - ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: ORDER DISSOLVE TEMP INJ SIGNED 3-31-2016. ORIG/CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: PARKER, TONYA; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - REINSTATE (OCA and REOPEN CASE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketNOTE - ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: ORDER DISM SIGNED 3-30-2016. ORIG/CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketNOTE - ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: ORDER REOPEN CASE SIGNED 3-30-2016. ORIG/CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for AIM ASSOCIATION INSURANCE MANAGEMENT, INC. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 19587-2016-DCLK; AIM ASSOCIATION INSURANCE MANAGEMENT, INC. $15.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for AIM ASSOCIATION INSURANCE MANAGEMENT, INC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $15.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • DocketNOTE - ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: ORDER REOPEN SUBMITTED TO JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: ORDER AGREED RE-OPEN PUT IN ADMIN QUE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for AIM ASSOCIATION INSURANCE MANAGEMENT, INC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $903.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • FinancialFinancial: AIM ASSOCIATION INSURANCE MANAGEMENT, INC. ; Total Financial Assessment $1,288.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $1,288.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PAYMENT; Comment: Copies for Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less