Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 12/04/2020 at 10:43:34 (UTC).

The State of Texas VS. Yuldashev, Hodjiabror

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Yuldashev, Hodjiabror. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Baxter, Lance. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Baxter, Lance

 

Party Details

Defendant

Yuldashev, Hodjiabror

Dallas, TX 75201

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

American Surety Company/80192

1202 W. University Dr.

Mckinney, TX 75069

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

James Joseph Mongaras

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Greg Willis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Charge # 1 Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $817.00, Payments: $817.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($717.00); Payor: Yuldashev, Hodjiabror; Receipt: Receipt # CC-CR-06032-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $817.00, Payments: $817.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($100.00); Description: CR - Jail Time Served Credit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $817.00, Payments: $817.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $817.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketDiscovery Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketBill of Cost

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketBond Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketSentenced - Probation/Community Supervision

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketPlea

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketPlea; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Rescheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketPlea; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: COVID-19 EMERGENCY DISASTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketPlea; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Rescheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketFirst Appearance; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Passed - Attorney Present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketMotion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketLetter of Representation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNotice to Appear Issued - $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCase Filed By Information (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketBond Information - $10.00; Comments: 201905963/$1,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2019
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 54040009 Description: DRIVING WHILE INTOXICATED Degree: 112; Level: Class B Misdemeanor; Statute: 49.04 PC; Arresting Agency: Plano Police Department; Arrest Date: 04/06/2019; Filing Agency: Plano Police Department

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Surety Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Joseph Mongaras