Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 04/27/2021 at 07:44:04 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. YOSHIO VILLARREAL WONG

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against YOSHIO VILLARREAL WONG. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Not Yet Classified.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0174

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Administration Building

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Defendant

VILLARREAL WONG, YOSHIO NONE

Dallas, TX 75208

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketMail Returned; Comments: Case status hring

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketCase Status Hearing; Time: 3:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketCase Status Hearing; Comments: Hring 11/18 @ 3 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNotice Letter Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketMail Returned; Comments: past due notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketMailed Past Due Notice; Comments: Capias Not 11/4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketShowcause Hearing (OCA); Time: 10:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: No Show

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketShow Cause Hearing Set; Comments: Hring 10/9 @ 10AM; def needs to pay fines; mailed notice to def

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Charge # 1 Deferred Disposition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketPre-Trial; Time: 9:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Per Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketSet for Pre-trial; Comments: Reset Hring 5/12 @ 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint Filed with Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint Requested from Officer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketSet for Pre-trial; Comments: Hring 3/17 @ 9:30 AM; mailed and emailed notice to def

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketPlea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNot Guilty Plea Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $126.10, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$126.10; Transactions: Amount: $207.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCitation Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2019
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 06922 Description: SPEEDING-10% OR MORE ABOVE POSTED SPEED (#) 80/70 Degree: 114; Level: Misdemeanor Traffic; Statute: 545.351; Fine Amount: $81.90; Filing Agency: Department of Public Safety

    Read MoreRead Less