Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 12/04/2020 at 18:01:09 (UTC).

The State of Texas VS. Sotzen, Cody Richard

Case Summary

On 01/16/2020 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Sotzen, Cody Richard. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wilson, Dan K. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wilson, Dan K

 

Party Details

Defendant

Sotzen, Cody Richard

Plano, TX 75075

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Joshua D Smith

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Greg Willis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Charge # 1 Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $339.50, Payments: $339.50, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $37.50; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $339.50, Payments: $339.50, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $302.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketBond Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCash Bond Release; Comments: In Progress

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketBill of Cost

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketSentenced - Local Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketPlea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDiscovery Log

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketAnnouncement; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketAppearance with Attorney; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketAppearance with Attorney; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAppearance with Attorney; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Passed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketTFDA - Not Eligible

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketFirst Appearance; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Passed - Defendant Present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice to Appear Issued - $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCase Filed By Information (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketBond Information - $10.00; Comments: 201917340/$750

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2019
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 35620008 Description: POSS MARIJ <2OZ Degree: 112; Level: Class B Misdemeanor; Statute: 481.121(b)(1) HSC; Arresting Agency: Plano Police Department; Arrest Date: 10/26/2019; Filing Agency: Plano Police Department

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua D Smith