This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 03/07/2021 at 17:18:24 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Rudy Clyde Reyna, Jr.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Rudy Clyde Reyna, Jr. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Flint, George B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Flint, George B.

 

Party Details

Defendant

Reyna, Rudy Clyde, Jr.

1035 N Morocco Ave

Dallas, TX 75211

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Lexington National Insurance Company/80123

1011 S Cockrell Hill Rd , Ste 105

Cockrell Hill, TX 75211

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Lara Bracamonte Davila

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Greg Willis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketAnnouncement; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketFirst Appearance; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketTFDA Indigent Packet - Attorney Appointment Eligible

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketFirst Appearance; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice to Appear Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase Filed by Indictment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketApproving Bond by Sheriff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketRe-Indicted to New Case; Comments: 20-439

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 22990001 Description: BURGLARY OF BUILDING Degree: 110; Level: State Jail Felony; Statute: 30.02(c)(1); Filing Agency: Frisco Police Department

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Reyna, Rudy Clyde, Jr. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lexington National Ins Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lara Bracamonte Davila