Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/03/2021 at 13:54:16 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. RONNIE RANDLES

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RONNIE RANDLES. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0186

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Administration Building

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Defendant

RANDLES, RONNIE

Fort Worth, TX 76112

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $186.80, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$186.80; Transactions: Amount: $10.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketSent to OMNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • WarrantRANDLES, RONNIE; Issued; Warrant (OCA Line 2a, 2b and 2c); Address: FORT WORTH,TX 76112; Charge Desc: NO DRIVER LICENSE WHEN UNLICENSED-NOT CDL; Warrant Type: Warrant (OCA Line 2a, 2b and 2c); Warrant Status: Issued; Warrant Location: Justice Court Pct. 1; Date Warrant Recd: 07/22/2020; Bond Amount: $0.00; Fine Amount: $136.00; Court Costs Bal.: $91.00; Fine Amount Bal.: $55.00; Attorney Fees Bal.: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $186.80, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$186.80; Transactions: Amount: $40.80; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketWarrant Issued Regular (OCA Inactive)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketSent to Collection Agency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketJP1 Collection Letter Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketJP1 Collection Letter; Comments: Wrnt Not 4/4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $186.80, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$186.80; Transactions: Amount: $136.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCitation Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2020
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 01908 Description: NO DRIVER LICENSE WHEN UNLICENSED-NOT CDL Degree: 114; Level: Misdemeanor Traffic; Statute: 521.021; Fine Amount: $55.00; Filing Agency: Department of Public Safety

    Read MoreRead Less