This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 09/05/2020 at 00:03:27 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Roger Hall

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Roger Hall. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0733

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Defendant

Hall, Roger Joseph

Mesquite, TX 75149-0000

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Charge # 1 Dismissed after Driver's Safety Course

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketDisposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketDriver Safety Course Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketNote; Comments: ext to complete dsc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketNote; Comments: request for extensiont to complete dsc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketShowcause Hearing (OCA); Time: 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: mailed to defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketNote; Comments: ext to complete the dsc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $110.00, Payments: $110.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($110.00); Payor: Hall, Roger Joseph; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-01414-JP2; Description: Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $110.00, Payments: $110.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $9.90; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Insurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketPlea

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketDriver Safety Course Requested and Granted (Form)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $110.00, Payments: $110.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $182.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketCitation Filed (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2019
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 06922 Description: SPEEDING-10% OR MORE ABOVE POSTED SPEED (#) 76/65 Degree: 114; Level: Misdemeanor Traffic; Statute: 545.351; Fine Amount: $81.90; Filing Agency: Department of Public Safety

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less