This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 08/26/2021 at 14:01:46 (UTC).

The State of Texas VS. Pressley, Nicholas Allen

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Pressley, Nicholas Allen. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Mason, Corinne A.. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Mason, Corinne A.

 

Party Details

Defendant

Pressley, Nicholas Allen

Wylie, TX 75098

Not Classified By Court

Dillard, Wynn/75094

Mckinney, TX 75069

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Greg Willis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketBond Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketAffidavit to Discharge Surety - CCP 17.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCase Filed By Information (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • WarrantPressley, Nicholas Allen; In Custody -Out ofState; Affidavit Surrender Principal; Address: Wylie,TX 75098; Charge Desc: POSS DANGEROUS DRUG; Warrant Type: Affidavit Surrender Principal; Warrant Status: In Custody -Out ofState; Warrant Location: Sheriff's Office; Date Warrant Recd: 07/14/2021; Bond Amount: $500.00; Fine Amount: $0.00; Court Costs Bal.: $0.00; Fine Amount Bal.: $0.00; Attorney Fees Bal.: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketWarrant; Comments: ATSP - W202006494

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketBond Information - $10.00; Comments: 202006494/$500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 35990023 Description: POSS CS PG 3 < 28G Degree: 111; Level: Class A Misdemeanor; Statute: 481.117(b); Arresting Agency: Wylie Police Department; Arrest Date: 05/21/2020; Filing Agency: Wylie Police Department

    Read MoreRead Less