Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 12/04/2020 at 06:25:04 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Norma Torres

Case Summary

On 01/16/2020 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Norma Torres. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0394

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Administration Building

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Defendant

Torres, Norma Giselle

Mckinney, TX 75069

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketDismissed by State

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketPre-Trial; Time: 9:30 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketPC Affidavit Returned to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint Filed with Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint Requested from Officer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketTrial Notice Given to Defendant in Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketSet for Pre-trial; Comments: Hrg 2/25@9:30am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketPlea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNot Guilty Plea Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketJP1 Collection Letter; Comments: Wrnt Not 3/28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $0.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $276.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCitation Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 04601 Description: FAIL TO MAINTAIN FINANCIAL RESPONSIBILITY Degree: 114; Level: Misdemeanor Traffic; Statute: 601.051; Fine Amount: $195.00; Filing Agency: Collin County Sheriff's Office

    Read MoreRead Less