Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 12/04/2020 at 18:02:23 (UTC).

The State of Texas VS. Miller, Chance Alexander

Case Summary

On 01/16/2020 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Miller, Chance Alexander. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Bender, Jay. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Bender, Jay

 

Party Details

Defendant

Miller, Chance Alexander

Plano, TX 75023

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Maria T Tu

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Greg Willis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Charge # 1 Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $200.00, Payments: $200.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $100.00; Description: CR - Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $200.00, Payments: $200.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($200.00); Description: CR - Jail Time Served Credit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $200.00, Payments: $200.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $300.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketPlea Bargain Packet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCash Bond Release Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSentenced - Local Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketPlea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketPlea; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketPlea or Set for Trial; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Case Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketPlea; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Passed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketAnnouncement - Last Pass; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Passed - Attorney Present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketAnnouncement; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Passed - Attorney Present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketFirst Appearance; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Passed - Defendant Present with Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice to Appear Issued - $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketTFDA - Order for Court Appointed Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCase Filed By Information (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketBond Information - $10.00; Comments: 201912884/$500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2019
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 35620008 Description: POSS MARIJ <2OZ Degree: 112; Level: Class B Misdemeanor; Statute: 481.121(b)(1) HSC; Arresting Agency: Plano Police Department; Arrest Date: 08/03/2019; Filing Agency: Plano Police Department

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greg Willis