This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 02/21/2021 at 17:35:40 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Miguel Lopez

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Miguel Lopez. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Flint, George B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Flint, George B.

 

Party Details

Defendant

Lopez, Miguel (j)

Mckinney, TX 75070

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Malcolm Miranda

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Greg Willis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketAnnouncement; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketFirst Appearance; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $35.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$35.00; Transactions: Amount: $35.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketPreceptExecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCourt Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice to Appear Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPrecept to Serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketTFDA Indigent Packet - Attorney Appointment Eligible

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketApplication; Comments: Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Seeing Bail Bond Reduction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketLetter of Representation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase Filed by Indictment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • WarrantLopez, Miguel; Return to Court; Municipal Warrant McKinney PD; Address: McKinney,TX 78507; Charge Desc: ASSAULT PEACE OFFICER/JUDGE; Warrant Type: Municipal Warrant McKinney PD; Warrant Status: Return to Court; Warrant Location: Sheriff's Office; Date Warrant Recd: 10/30/2020; Bond Amount: $50,000.00; Fine Amount: $0.00; Court Costs Bal.: $0.00; Fine Amount Bal.: $0.00; Attorney Fees Bal.: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketPre-IndictmentWarrant Fees; Comments: A470-10302020-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 13990082 Description: ASSAULT PEACE OFFICER/JUDGE Degree: 107; Level: Second Degree Felony; Statute: 22.01(b-2); Arresting Agency: McKinney Police Department; Arrest Date: 10/30/2020; Filing Agency: McKinney Police Department

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Malcolm Miranda