This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 02/27/2021 at 17:09:36 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Lisa Carol Schiller

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Lisa Carol Schiller. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Tucker, Angela. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Tucker, Angela

 

Party Details

Defendant

Schiller, Lisa Carol

Wylie, TX 75098

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Greg Willis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketAppearance with Attorney; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketFirst Appearance; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice to Appear Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase Filed by Indictment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketApproving Bond by Sheriff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketPre-IndictmentWarrant Fees; Comments: F401-2-26-20-WPD1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 26050014 Description: CREDIT CARD OR DEBIT CARD ABUSE Degree: 110; Level: State Jail Felony; Statute: 32.31; Arresting Agency: Wylie Police Department; Arrest Date: 02/27/2020; Filing Agency: Wylie Police Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • WarrantSchiller, Lisa Carol; Return to Court; Municipal Warrant; Address: Wylie,TX 75098; Charge Desc: CREDIT CARD OR DEBIT CARD ABUSE; Warrant Type: Municipal Warrant; Warrant Status: Return to Court; Warrant Location: Sheriff's Office; Date Warrant Recd: 02/26/2020; Bond Amount: $20,000.00; Fine Amount: $0.00; Court Costs Bal.: $0.00; Fine Amount Bal.: $0.00; Attorney Fees Bal.: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greg Willis