This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 02/20/2021 at 17:09:34 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Lindsey Calvert Glenn

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Lindsey Calvert Glenn. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Tucker, Angela. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Tucker, Angela

 

Party Details

Defendant

Glenn, Lindsey Calvert

Prosper, TX 75078

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Todd Shapiro

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Greg Willis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketFirst Appearance; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice to Appear Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketTFDA Intends to Hire Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketLetter of Representation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase Filed by Indictment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketApproving Bond by Sheriff; Comments: Cash Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketPre-IndictmentWarrant Fees; Comments: 2020-P-220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • WarrantGlenn, Lindsey Calvert; Return to Court; Municipal Warrant Plano PD; Address: Prosper,TX 75078; Charge Desc: THEFT PROP >=$30K<$150K; Warrant Type: Municipal Warrant Plano PD; Warrant Status: Return to Court; Warrant Location: Sheriff's Office; Date Warrant Recd: 02/18/2020; Bond Amount: $10,000.00; Fine Amount: $0.00; Court Costs Bal.: $0.00; Fine Amount Bal.: $0.00; Attorney Fees Bal.: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2017
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 23990198 Description: THEFT PROP >=$30K<$150K Degree: 108; Level: Third Degree Felony; Statute: 31.03(e)(5); Arresting Agency: Prosper Police Department; Arrest Date: 02/24/2020; Filing Agency: Plano Police Department

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd Shapiro