This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 03/15/2021 at 20:07:35 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Linda Holmes

Case Summary

On 08/14/2019 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Linda Holmes. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1923

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Defendant

Holmes, Linda Sue

Farmersville, TX 75442

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • WarrantHolmes, Linda Sue; Received / Active; Capias Pro Fine Warrant (OCA Line 3); Address: Farmersville,TX 75442; Charge Desc: NO DRIVER'S LICENSE WHEN UNLICENSED - NOT CDL; Warrant Type: Capias Pro Fine Warrant (OCA Line 3); Warrant Status: Received / Active; Warrant Location: Constable Pct2; Date Warrant Recd: 09/21/2020; Bond Amount: $0.00; Fine Amount: $54.90; Court Costs Bal.: $50.00; Fine Amount Bal.: $42.00; Attorney Fees Bal.: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $197.00, Payments: $105.00, Balance:$92.00; Transactions: Amount: $50.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCapias Pro-fine Warrant Issued (OCA Inactive)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketShowcause Hearing (OCA); Time: 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketPhone Call Per OCA Compliance; Comments: Defendant was told that he could request a payment plan, request community service if unable to pay or request a hearing for judge to consider the ability to pay.They were also told that they would need to fill out an application to determine payment ability and arrangements.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketPhone Call Per OCA Compliance; Comments: Defendant was told that he could request a payment plan, request community service if unable to pay or request a hearing for judge to consider the ability to pay.They were also told that they would need to fill out an application to determine payment ability and arrangements.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketExtension to Pay

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketShowcause Hearing (OCA); Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: mailed to defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketExtension to Pay

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $197.00, Payments: $105.00, Balance:$92.00; Transactions: Amount: ($80.00); Payor: Holmes, Linda Sue; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-03272-JP2; Description: Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $197.00, Payments: $105.00, Balance:$92.00; Transactions: Amount: $25.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketPartial Payment; Comments: $40 paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Docket2ND Extension Granted with Time Pay Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketPlea

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketExtension to Pay

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $197.00, Payments: $105.00, Balance:$92.00; Transactions: Amount: $122.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketCitation Filed (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 01908 Description: NO DRIVER'S LICENSE WHEN UNLICENSED - NOT CDL Degree: 114; Level: Misdemeanor Traffic; Statute: 521.021; Fine Amount: $54.90; Filing Agency: Lavon Police Department

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less