This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 02/27/2021 at 17:09:57 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Kody W Duke

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Kody W Duke. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Tucker, Angela. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Tucker, Angela

 

Party Details

Defendant

Duke, Kody W

Dallas, TX 75208

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Bankers Insurance Company/80219

400 N Oconnor Rd

Irving, TX 75061

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Mark Heidenheimer

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Greg Willis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketAnnouncement; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketFirst Appearance; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice to Appear Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketTFDA Indigent Packet - Attorney Appointment Eligible

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase Filed by Indictment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketApproving Bond by Sheriff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2020
  • DocketPre-IndictmentWarrant Fees; Comments: COL20-012F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2019
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 26070265 Description: INSURANCE FRAUD W/INT TO DEFRAUD/DECEIVE Degree: 110; Level: State Jail Felony; Statute: 35.02(d); Filing Agency: Carrollton Police Department

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bankers Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Heidenheimer