This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 02/20/2021 at 17:10:10 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Jose Yovanny De Leon Ramirez

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jose Yovanny De Leon Ramirez. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgeworth, Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Edgeworth, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Defendant

De Leon Ramirez, Jose Yovanny (j)

Dallas, TX 75228

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Eva Arellano

Malcolm Miranda

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Greg Willis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketFirst Appearance; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $35.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$35.00; Transactions: Amount: $35.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketPreceptExecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketLetter of Representation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCourt Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice to Appear Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketPrecept to Serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketTFDA Indigent Packet - Attorney Appointment Eligible

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase Filed by Indictment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 11990002 Description: SEXUAL ASSAULT CHILD Degree: 107; Level: Second Degree Felony; Statute: 22.011(a)(2); Arresting Agency: Plano Police Department; Arrest Date: 10/27/2020; Filing Agency: Plano Police Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketArrest Fee Onsite - Sheriff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Malcolm Miranda