Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 12/04/2020 at 10:44:50 (UTC).

The State of Texas VS. Johnson, Forrest Taylor

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Johnson, Forrest Taylor. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Bender, Jay. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Bender, Jay

 

Party Details

Defendant

Johnson, Forrest Taylor

Farmers Branch, TX 75244

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Aaron C Harper

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Greg Willis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketExecuted Commitment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketBond Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Charge # 1 Convicted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $452.00, Payments: $452.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $25.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $452.00, Payments: $452.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $427.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCash Bond Release; Comments: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCash Bond Release; Comments: In Progress

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketBill of Cost

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketSentenced - Local Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketAnnouncement - Last Pass; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Per Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketAnnouncement; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Passed - Attorney Present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketAppearance with Attorney; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Passed - Defendant Present with Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketLetter of Representation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketDangers & Disadvantages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketFirst Appearance; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Passed - Defendant Present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice to Appear Issued - $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCase Filed By Information (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketBond Information - $10.00; Comments: 201906872/$500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2019
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 54040009 Description: DRIVING WHILE INTOXICATED Degree: 112; Level: Class B Misdemeanor; Statute: 49.04 PC; Arresting Agency: Plano Police Department; Arrest Date: 04/20/2019; Filing Agency: Plano Police Department

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron C Harper