This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 03/06/2021 at 17:16:38 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Joel Mansfield Bewley

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Joel Mansfield Bewley. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Flint, George B.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Flint, George B.

 

Party Details

Defendants

Bewley, Joel Mansfield (j)

Allen, TX 75013

Bewley, Joel Mansfield

Allen, TX 75013

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Stephanie Duecker Hudson

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Greg Willis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAnnouncement; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCommitment to Sheriff's Office; Comments: Emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCommitment CC Jail Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $330.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$330.00; Transactions: Amount: $295.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketBill of Cost

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DispositionDispositions-: Charge # 1 Convicted:Guilty Plea - No Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDC-Collin County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPlea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDiscovery Acknowledgement

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketFirst Appearance; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $330.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$330.00; Transactions: Amount: $35.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketPreceptExecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCourt Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice to Appear Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPrecept to Serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketTFDA Indigent Packet - Attorney Appointment Eligible

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase Filed by Indictment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2020
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 13990001 Description: ASSAULT CAUSES BODILY INJ Degree: 111; Level: Class A Misdemeanor; Statute: 22.01 (a)(1); Arresting Agency: Plano Police Department; Arrest Date: 11/08/2020; Filing Agency: Plano Police Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2020
  • DocketArrest Fee Onsite - Sheriff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie Duecker Hudson