This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 02/20/2021 at 17:12:30 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Joel Charrez-Baxcajay

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Joel Charrez-Baxcajay. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Roach, John R., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Roach, John R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Defendant

Charrez-Baxcajay, Joel (j)

Wylie, TX 75098

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Joel Petrazio

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Greg Willis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketFirst Appearance; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCourt Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $35.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$35.00; Transactions: Amount: $35.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketPreceptExecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice to Appear Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketPrecept to Serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketTFDA Indigent Packet - Attorney Appointment Eligible

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase Filed by Indictment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • WarrantCharrez-Baxcajay, Joel; Returned Executed; Municipal Warrant; Address: Wylie,TX 75098; Charge Desc: EVADING ARREST DETENTION W/VEH OR WATERCRAFT; Warrant Type: Municipal Warrant; Warrant Status: Returned Executed; Warrant Location: Sheriff's Office; Date Warrant Recd: 12/02/2020; Bond Amount: $5,000.00; Fine Amount: $0.00; Court Costs Bal.: $0.00; Fine Amount Bal.: $0.00; Attorney Fees Bal.: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketPre-IndictmentWarrant Fees; Comments: 2020-P-895

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 48010016 Description: EVADING ARREST DETENTION W/VEH OR WATERCRAFT Degree: 110; Level: State Jail Felony; Statute: 38.04(b)(1)(B); Arresting Agency: Collin County Sheriff's Office; Arrest Date: 12/17/2020; Filing Agency: Plano Police Department

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joel Petrazio