This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 02/27/2021 at 17:10:27 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Jack William Givens

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jack William Givens. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgeworth, Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Edgeworth, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Defendant

Givens, Jack William

Plano, TX 75074

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

US Specialty Insurance Company/80280

201 W Boyd Dr , Ste 105B

Allen, TX 75013

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Scott E Edgett

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Greg Willis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketAnnouncement; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketFirst Appearance; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice to Appear Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketLetter of Representation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase Filed by Indictment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketApproving Bond by Sheriff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketPre-IndictmentWarrant Fees; Comments: F19-1502-UTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2017
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 2 Code: 11990001 Description: SEXUAL ASSAULT Degree: 107; Level: Second Degree Felony; Statute: 22.011(a)(1); Filing Agency: University of Texas at Dallas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2017
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 11990001 Description: SEXUAL ASSAULT Degree: 107; Level: Second Degree Felony; Statute: 22.011(a)(1); Filing Agency: University of Texas at Dallas

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U S Specialty Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott E Edgett