Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 12/04/2020 at 17:55:28 (UTC).

The State of Texas VS. Gabriel, Thomas Jordan

Case Summary

On 01/16/2020 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Gabriel, Thomas Jordan. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Baxter, Lance. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Baxter, Lance

 

Party Details

Defendant

Gabriel, Thomas Jordan

Plano, TX 75023

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Pr Bonds Ccl Dc Master Acct./77896

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Mark Sparkman O'Bryan, Jr.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Greg Willis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNISI Filed; Comments: 003-25271-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • WarrantGabriel, Thomas Jordan; Received / Active; Bond Forfeiture; Address: Memphis,TN 38108; Charge Desc: POSS MARIJ <2OZ; Warrant Type: Bond Forfeiture; Warrant Status: Received / Active; Warrant Location: Sheriff's Office; Date Warrant Recd: 02/24/2020; Bond Amount: $1,000.00; Fine Amount: $0.00; Court Costs Bal.: $0.00; Fine Amount Bal.: $0.00; Attorney Fees Bal.: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketWarrant Issued - $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketJudge's Docket Entry - Bond Forfeited; Comments: Defendant failed to appear in court. Bond is forfeited. Warrant will be issued for defendant's arrest. New bond is set at $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketFirst Appearance; Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice to Appear Issued - $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCase Filed By Information (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketTFDA - Order for Court Appointed Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketBond Information - $10.00; Comments: 201910918/$500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2019
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 35620008 Description: POSS MARIJ <2OZ Degree: 112; Level: Class B Misdemeanor; Statute: 481.121(b)(1) HSC; Arresting Agency: Plano Police Department; Arrest Date: 06/30/2019; Filing Agency: Plano Police Department

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Sparkman O'Bryan, Jr.