This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 02/20/2021 at 17:12:50 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Eric Ashley Waite

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Eric Ashley Waite. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Roach, John R., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Roach, John R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Defendant

Waite, Eric Ashley

Frisco, TX 75035

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Todd Shapiro

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Greg Willis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketFirst Appearance; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice to Appear Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketLetter of Representation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase Filed by Indictment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketApproving Bond by Sheriff; Comments: Cash Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 54040028 Description: DRIVING WHILE INTOXICATED W/CHILD UNDER 15 YOA Degree: 110; Level: State Jail Felony; Statute: 49.045(b) PC; Arresting Agency: Plano Police Department; Arrest Date: 08/07/2020; Filing Agency: Plano Police Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketArrest Fee Onsite - Sheriff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd Shapiro