This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 02/27/2021 at 17:17:01 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Dylan Trent Simpson

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Dylan Trent Simpson. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Flint, George B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Flint, George B.

 

Party Details

Defendant

Simpson, Dylan Trent

The Colony, TX 75056

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Greg Willis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketAnnouncement; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketFirst Appearance; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice to Appear Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketTFDA Intends to Hire Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase Filed by Indictment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketApproving Bond by Sheriff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketPre-IndictmentWarrant Fees; Comments: F401-11-25-19-PPD2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • WarrantSimpson, Dylan Trent; Returned Executed; Municipal Warrant Plano PD; Address: The Colony,TX 75056; Charge Desc: SEXUAL ASSAULT; Warrant Type: Municipal Warrant Plano PD; Warrant Status: Returned Executed; Warrant Location: Sheriff's Office; Date Warrant Recd: 11/25/2019; Bond Amount: $25,000.00; Fine Amount: $0.00; Court Costs Bal.: $0.00; Fine Amount Bal.: $0.00; Attorney Fees Bal.: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2019
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 11990001 Description: SEXUAL ASSAULT Degree: 107; Level: Second Degree Felony; Statute: 22.011(a)(1); Arresting Agency: Collin County Sheriff's Office; Arrest Date: 11/26/2019; Filing Agency: Plano Police Department

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greg Willis