This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 02/27/2021 at 17:20:48 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Devin Joe Zimmerman

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Devin Joe Zimmerman. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Thompson, Andrea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Thompson, Andrea

 

Party Details

Defendant

Zimmerman, Devin Joe

Mckinney, TX 75070

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Wesley Spencer

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Greg Willis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketAnnouncement; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketFirst Appearance; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice to Appear Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketTFDA Indigent Packet - Attorney Appointment Eligible

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase Filed by Indictment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketApproving Bond by Sheriff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 49990002 Description: ESCAPE WHILE ARRESTED/CONFINED FELONY Degree: 108; Level: Third Degree Felony; Statute: 38.06(c); Arresting Agency: Princeton Police Department; Arrest Date: 10/09/2020; Filing Agency: Princeton Police Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketArrest Fee Onsite - Sheriff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wesley Spencer