This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 02/20/2021 at 17:16:46 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Bryce Allan Heese

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Bryce Allan Heese. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Flint, George B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Flint, George B.

 

Party Details

Defendant

Heese, Bryce Allan

Plano, TX 75074

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Stephen H. Miller

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Greg Willis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketWarrant Recalled; Comments: W202005630

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • WarrantHeese, Bryce Allan; In Custody - Dallas County; Capias; Address: Plano,TX 75074; Charge Desc: TAMPER/FABRICATE PHYS EVID W/INTENT TO IMPAIR; Warrant Type: Capias; Warrant Status: In Custody - Dallas County; Warrant Location: Sheriff's Office; Date Warrant Recd: 01/26/2021; Bond Amount: $5,000.00; Fine Amount: $0.00; Court Costs Bal.: $0.00; Fine Amount Bal.: $0.00; Attorney Fees Bal.: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketTFDA Indigent Packet - Attorney Appointment Eligible

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase Filed by Indictment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • WarrantHeese, Bryce Allan; Received Recalled Warrant; Affidavit of CCP 17.16 - Discharge of Surety; Address: Plano,TX 75074; Charge Desc: TAMPER/FABRICATE PHYS EVID W/INTENT TO IMPAIR; Warrant Type: Affidavit of CCP 17.16 - Discharge of Surety; Warrant Status: Received Recalled Warrant; Warrant Location: District Clerk; Date Warrant Recd: 06/18/2020; Bond Amount: $5,000.00; Fine Amount: $0.00; Court Costs Bal.: $0.00; Fine Amount Bal.: $0.00; Attorney Fees Bal.: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketPre-IndictmentWarrant Fees; Comments: W202005630

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketAffidavit for Art.17.16 CCP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketApproving Bond by Sheriff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 48040003 Description: TAMPER/FABRICATE PHYS EVID W/INTENT TO IMPAIR Degree: 108; Level: Third Degree Felony; Statute: 37.09(c); Arresting Agency: Plano Police Department; Arrest Date: 04/30/2020; Filing Agency: Plano Police Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketArrest Fee Onsite - Sheriff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greg Willis