This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 03/07/2021 at 17:18:30 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Brayden Kade Malacusky

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Brayden Kade Malacusky. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Thompson, Andrea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Thompson, Andrea

 

Party Details

Defendant

Malacusky, Brayden Kade (j)

Mckinney, TX 75070

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Harrison Pask

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Greg Willis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAnnouncement; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketAnnouncement; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketFirst Appearance; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $35.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$35.00; Transactions: Amount: $35.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketPreceptExecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice to Appear Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPrecept to Serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketTFDA Indigent Packet - Attorney Appointment Eligible

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase Filed by Indictment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • DocketPre-IndictmentWarrant Fees; Comments: 46910212020A001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • WarrantMalacusky, Brayden Kade; Return to Court; Municipal Warrant; Address: Princeton,TX 75407; Charge Desc: CRUELTY NON-LIVESTK ANIM:KILL/POISON/SBI; Warrant Type: Municipal Warrant; Warrant Status: Return to Court; Warrant Location: Sheriff's Office; Date Warrant Recd: 10/21/2020; Bond Amount: $25,000.00; Fine Amount: $0.00; Court Costs Bal.: $0.00; Fine Amount Bal.: $0.00; Attorney Fees Bal.: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2020
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 72010001 Description: CRUELTY NON-LIVESTK ANIM:KILL/POISON/SBI Degree: 108; Level: Third Degree Felony; Statute: 42.092(c-1); Arresting Agency: Princeton Police Department; Arrest Date: 11/27/2020; Filing Agency: Collin County Sheriff's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harrison Pask