This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 11/09/2020 at 22:05:24 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Bobby Enochs

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Bobby Enochs. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2288

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Defendant

Enochs, Bobby F

Nevada, TX 75173

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Mckinney, TX 75071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketWarrant Returned to Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Charge # 1 Guilty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketDisposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketDefendant Deceased

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketRecalled Warrant (OCA Active)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • WarrantEnochs, Bobby F; Served; Capias Pro Fine Warrant (OCA Line 3); Address: Nevada,TX 75173; Charge Desc: SPEEDING OVER LIMIT 97/60; Warrant Type: Capias Pro Fine Warrant (OCA Line 3); Warrant Status: Served; Warrant Location: Constable Pct2; Date Warrant Recd: 08/27/2020; Bond Amount: $0.00; Fine Amount: $181.90; Court Costs Bal.: $0.00; Fine Amount Bal.: $0.00; Attorney Fees Bal.: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $50.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketCapias Pro-fine Warrant Issued (OCA Inactive)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketShowcause Hearing (OCA); Time: 2:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: mailed to defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($50.00); Payor: Enochs, Bobby F; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-03764-JP2; Description: Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketPartial Payment; Comments: $50 paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • Docket2nd Extension Granted; Comments: failed to add timepay

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketExtension to Pay

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketPartial Payment; Comments: 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($50.00); Payor: Enochs, Bobby F; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-03522-JP2; Description: Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketPlea

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $302.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketCitation Filed (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 06917 Description: SPEEDING OVER LIMIT 97/60 Degree: 114; Level: Misdemeanor Traffic; Statute: 545.351; Fine Amount: $181.90; Filing Agency: Lavon Police Department

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less