Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/08/2021 at 03:27:15 (UTC).

Ziecha Norwillo vs. Jose Livings

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Ziecha Norwillo filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jose Livings. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0403

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Administration Building

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Norwillo, Ziecha L

Mckinney, TX 75071

Defendant

Livings, Jose Ross

Prosper, TX 75078

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketDocket Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketTrial Before The Court for JP's; Time: 10:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketEmail Sent to Party; Comments: zoom hring info to plf and def

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketTrial by Judge; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketEmail Sent to Party; Comments: emailed def new hring notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties; Comments: DEF 7.22 @ 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEmail Sent to Party; Comments: Plaintiff 7/22 @ 10

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCitation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $126.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($126.00); Payor: Norwillo, Ziecha L; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-007984-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued for Service To:; Comments: Collin County Pct. 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less