Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 05/18/2020 at 00:08:51 (UTC).

ZFN Realty vs. Matt Santoro,All Other Occupants

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 ZFN Realty filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Matt Santoro,All Other Occupants. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Missildine, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0340

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Missildine, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZFN Realty

Dallas, TX 75254

Defendants

All Other Occupants

Santoro, Matt

Lucas, TX 75002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Sheetz

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $316.00, Payments: $316.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($185.00); Payor: zachary sadeghian; Receipt: Receipt # 2020-0000959-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $316.00, Payments: $316.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $185.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence Received From Plaintiff; Comments: Court of Appeals Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession Filed with The Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketAppeal Received Document(s) from CCL Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketCertification of Transcript; Judge: Missildine, Mike; Comments: THE STATE OF TEXAS COUNTY OF COLLIN Missildine, Mike JUSTICE COURT 3-2I hereby certify that the attached 35 pages are true and exact copies of the official court records for case number 32-EV-19-00340Witnessed my hand and official seal at the Court in Plano, Collin County Texas06/19/2019By Leesa Lane Justice Court Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketBill of Cost

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketAppealed to CCL (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketStatement of Inability to Pay Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketSIP Contested; Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketMotion for Continuance by Defendant; Comments: bottom paragraph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketCorrespondence Received From Defendant; Comments: Refusal of citation/case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Returned to Court Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $316.00, Payments: $316.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: ZFN Realty; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0001691-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $316.00, Payments: $316.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketMailed Notice of Hearing; Comments: to Plaintiff Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketEviction Suit; Comments: Complaint for Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less