This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 11/12/2020 at 13:28:27 (UTC).

WYLIE ISD Vs. IRA LEROY HENSON, JR. AKA IRA L. HENSON, JR. ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/02/2006 WYLIE ISD filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against IRA LEROY HENSON, JR AKA IRA L HENSON, JR. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Oldner, Chris. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2906

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Oldner, Chris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wylie Isd

P.O. Box 1277

Denton, TX 76202

Defendants

Henson, Jr., Ira Leroy

Wylie, TX 75098

Henson, Pamela

Wylie, TX 750984304

Option One Mtg, Corp

Ct Corp., 350 N St Paul, #2900

Dallas, TX 75201

Feld, Paula K

Wylie, TX 75098

Feld, Jeffrey L

Wylie, TX 75098

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gilbert T. Bragg

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: DOCKET SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: ORDER OF DISMISSALSGND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: Disbursed $60.00 Check No. 8877 To: DERICK EVANS #1 For: OUT OF CNTY SER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2006
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $60.00, Payments: $60.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($50.00); Payor: Auto Generated Conversion Entr; Receipt: Receipt # DCVAGG211158; Description: Escrow from Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2006
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $60.00, Payments: $60.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($220.00); Payor: Auto Generated Conversion Entr; Receipt: Receipt # DCVAGG211157; Description: Escrow from Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2006
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $60.00, Payments: $60.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($90.00); Payor: Auto Generated Conversion Entr; Receipt: Receipt # DCVAGG211156; Description: Escrow from Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2006
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $60.00, Payments: $60.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($60.00); Payor: FNIS-FIDELTIY REAL ESTATE TAX; Receipt: Receipt # 031882700002; Description: OUT OF COUNTY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2006
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $60.00, Payments: $60.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $60.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: O/C SERV-DERICK EVANS/CONSTABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: S/R CIT-SHIRLEY DILLON/2-14-06 $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: ISSD CIT/DALLAS-R RICHARDSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: ISSD 4 CITS/BARTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2006
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $60.00, Payments: $60.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $50.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2006
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $60.00, Payments: $60.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $220.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2006
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $60.00, Payments: $60.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $90.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: REQ FOR TAX CITATION/NO MONEY REC'D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: 4 TAX CITS/SERVICE ONLY/NO MONEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: REQ FOR 4 TAX CITS/NO MONEY REC'D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: TAX SUITS/NO MONEY RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less