This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 02/23/2020 at 03:40:51 (UTC).

WYLIE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. REPUBLIC TELECOM SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 WYLIE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against REPUBLIC TELECOM SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0078

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WYLIE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott, 1919 S.Shiloh Rd.,Ste.310, Lb 40

Garland, TX 75042

Defendant

REPUBLIC TELECOM SERVICES, INC.

By Serving Registered Agent United States Corporation Services, 9900 Spectrum Drive

Austin, TX 78717

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erin Minett Hutto

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($51.00); Payor: WYLIE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-04215-JP2; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketDismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Case Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: ORDER TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketMotion for Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketMotion for Continuance; Comments: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties; Comments: for hearing on 11/05/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: CITATION EXECUTED CMR REPUBLIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $7,955.17;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Petition; Comments: PLAINTIFFSORIGINAL PETITION - BPP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less