This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 09/08/2019 at 16:51:38 (UTC).

WYLIE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. FRANKIE'S MEXICAN CUISINE, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 WYLIE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FRANKIE'S MEXICAN CUISINE, INC. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0080

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WYLIE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott, 1919 S.Shiloh Rd.,Ste.310, Lb 40

Garland, TX 75042

Defendant

FRANKIE'S MEXICAN CUISINE, INC.

By Serving Registered Agent Agustin Jimenez, 2701 Custer Parkway Suite 807

Richardson, TX 75080

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erin Minett Hutto

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • Receipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Motion for Non-Suit; Comments: ORDER TO NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Motion for Non-Suit; Comments: MOTION FOR NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Citation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Small Claims Petition; Comments: PLAINTIFFSORIGINAL PETITION - BPP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Civil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Receipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Case Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Cause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($126.00); Payor: WYLIE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-02980-JP2; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $126.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Cause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $1,451.61;

    Read MoreRead Less