This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/25/2022 at 15:27:40 (UTC).

WMCI DALLAS III LLC, dba BEXLEY LAKE FOREST vs. MARVIN THOMAS

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 WMCI DALLAS III LLC, dba BEXLEY LAKE FOREST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARVIN THOMAS. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0272

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WMCI DALLAS III LLC, dba BEXLEY LAKE FOREST

6300 La Calma Dr, Ste 150

Austin, TX 78752

Defendant

THOMAS, MARVIN

Mckinney, TX 75070

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 1:30 PM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Case Disposed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Dismissed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDismissed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDismissed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketE-Mailed Hearing Notice to Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Possession of Property; Remedy Amount: $0.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $129.00, Payments: $129.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($21.00); Description: State Credit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $129.00, Payments: $129.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($108.00); Payor: WMCI DALLAS III LLC, dba BEXLEY LAKE FOREST; Receipt: Receipt # 2022-001140-JP1; Description: Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $129.00, Payments: $129.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $129.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketEviction Suit; Comments: WMCI DALLAS III LLC, dba BEXLEY LAKE FOREST VS MARVIN THOMAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Papers-: Person to Serve: THOMAS, MARVIN Type: FORCIBLE; Origin: Justice of the Peace Precinct 1; Paper No: C1-22-000988; Location: PCT 1 Constable

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WMCI DALLAS III LLC, dba BEXLEY LAKE FOREST is a litigant