This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 04/01/2021 at 19:53:14 (UTC).

William Douglas Fisher vs. Bad Robot Productions, Inc.,Bad Robot Television, Inc.,Home Box Office, Inc.,HBO Home Entertainment, Inc.,Kilter Films, Inc.,Scary Neighborhood, LLC,Ripple Street Investments, LLC,Autonomy Productions, LLC,AT&T Services, In

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 William Douglas Fisher filed an Other lawsuit against Bad Robot Productions, Inc ,Bad Robot Television, Inc ,Home Box Office, Inc ,HBO Home Entertainment, Inc ,Kilter Films, Inc ,Scary Neighborhood, LLC,Ripple Street Investments, LLC,Autonomy Productions, LLC,AT T Services, In. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgeworth, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Edgeworth, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fisher, William Douglas

Defendants

HBO Home Entertainment, Inc.

Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman Llp, 10960 Wilshire Blvd, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Bad Robot Productions, Inc.

Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman Llp, 10960 Wilshire Blvd, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

AT&T Services, Inc.

Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman Llp, 10960 Wilshire Blvd, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Scary Neighborhood, LLC

Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman Llp, 10960 Wilshire Blvd, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Autonomy Productions, LLC

Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman Llp, 10960 Wilshire Blvd, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Home Box Office, Inc.

Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman Llp, 10960 Wilshire Blvd, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Bad Robot Television, Inc.

Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman Llp, 10960 Wilshire Blvd, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Ripple Street Investments, LLC

Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman Llp, 10960 Wilshire Blvd, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Novak Investments, LLC

Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman Llp, 10960 Wilshire Blvd, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Kilter Films, Inc.

Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman Llp, 10960 Wilshire Blvd, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Stacey F Blank

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $337.00, Payments: $337.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($24.00); Payor: Bad Robot Productions, Inc.; Receipt: Receipt # DC-01284-2021; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $337.00, Payments: $337.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $24.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketSubpoena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Subpoena $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Request for Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $337.00, Payments: $337.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($313.00); Payor: Bad Robot Productions, Inc.; Receipt: Receipt # DC-00743-2021; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $337.00, Payments: $337.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $313.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $313.00; Comments: Ex Parte Application for Issuance of a Deposition Subpoena Relating to an Out-of-State Case Pursuant to Tex. Civ. Prac. & Rem. Code Ann. 20.002

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kilter Films, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Home Box Office, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Corp. is a litigant