This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 03/18/2021 at 11:13:48 (UTC).

Wesley Oakley vs. RN Concrete,Ramiro Noguez

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 Wesley Oakley filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RN Concrete,Ramiro Noguez. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Pending - Appeal.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0073

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oakley, Wesley

Nevada, TX 75173

Defendants

Noguez, Ramiro

Nevada, TX 75173

RN Concrete

Nevada, TX 75173

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCounty Court at Law Letter; Comments: new Case # 004-00361-2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCertification of Transcript; Judge: Shaffer, Jerry; Comments: COUNTY OF COLLIN *I, Shaffer, Jerry,do hereby certify that the above and foregoing is a true and correct Transcript of the entries on my Docket, in the cause of the above plaintiff and defendant of Costs is a true and correct statement of the costs incurred in said cause to this date.Witness my official signature at 406A Raymond St, Farmersville Texas .01/12/2021,Shaffer, Jerry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketAppealed to CCL (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNote; Comments: Evidence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Motion Hearing; Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties; Comments: HEARING CHANGED TO ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties; Comments: Hearing for 1/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNote; Comments: Plantiff contested inability

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAffidavit of Inability to Give Security for Costs Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAppeal Bond Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing; Time: 10:30 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties; Comments: for court hearing on 12/07/20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCitation Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($201.00); Payor: Oakley, Wesley; Receipt: Receipt # 2020-01945-JP2; Description: Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $201.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Petition; Comments: Guide and File - Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less