This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 11/09/2020 at 09:16:44 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank, NA vs. Shaterrica A. Reed

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 Wells Fargo Bank, NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Shaterrica A Reed. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wheless, Ray. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wheless, Ray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank, NA

Vincent Serafino Geary Waddell Jenevein, P.C., 1601 Elm Street, Suite 4100

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant

Reed, Shaterrica A.

Plano, TX 75074-4846

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edgar Quijada

Edgar Quijada Mendez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketMailed; Comments: Judgment Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketOrder for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Time: 1:30 PM; Comments: Plaintiff s Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Comments: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Defendant's Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Defendant's Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Return Of Service - Shaterrica A. Reed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($306.00); Payor: Wells Fargo Bank, NA; Receipt: Receipt # DC-05410-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $306.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00

    Read MoreRead Less