This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 03/01/2020 at 00:13:29 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank, NA vs. Jeff Hsiao

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 Wells Fargo Bank, NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jeff Hsiao. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wheless, Cynthia M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wheless, Cynthia M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank, NA

Vincent Serafino Geary Waddell Jenevein, P.C., 1601 Elm Street, Suite 4100

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant

Hsiao, Jeff

Plano, TX 75024

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edgar Quijada

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment Letter Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketGeneral Docket Entry; Comments: Motion hearing.P appeared by atty C Tari; D did not appear.Default Judgment entered.CRW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketGeneral Docket Entry; Comments: Called hallway x3 Jeff Hsiao. No reply. RW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketMotion Hearing; Time: 2:00 PM; Comments: Hearing Result: Orders Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketCorrespondence; Comments: Coordinator's Email to District Clerk re Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketCorrespondence Received by Court; Comments: fax/e-mail received by the court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketCorrespondence; Comments: E-Mailed Court Coordinator Re: NOH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment; Comments: Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Citation - Jeff Hsiao - 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketOrder for Substituted Service; Comments: Order Granting Rule 106 Motion for Substituted Service of Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketMotion for Substituted Service; Comments: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, NA's Rule 106 Motion for Order Granting Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($306.00); Payor: Wells Fargo Bank, NA; Receipt: Receipt # DC-00873-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $306.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00

    Read MoreRead Less