This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 02/04/2020 at 05:37:52 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank, NA, vs. Brooke N. Brian

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 Wells Fargo Bank, NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Brooke N Brian. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Roach, John R., Jr. and Bouressa, Andrea. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Roach, John R., Jr.

Bouressa, Andrea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank, NA,

Vincent Serafino Geary Waddell Jenevein, P.C., 1601 Elm Street, Suite 4100

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant

Brian, Brooke N.

Oklahoma City, OK 73107

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Whitney Abbott

Defendant Attorney

Jacob Masters

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Case Settled; Comments: submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Agreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketMailed; Comments: judgment letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketAgreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketAdministrative Order; Comments: Order signed 9/30/2019 to transfer to the 471st.Order scanned into minutes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Comments: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Citation - Brooke N. Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Defendant's Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • DocketOrder for Substituted Service; Comments: Order Granting Rule 106 Motion for Substituted Service of Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketMotion for Substituted Service; Comments: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, NA's Rule 106 Motion for Order Granting Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($306.00); Payor: Wells Fargo Bank, NA,; Receipt: Receipt # DC-01438-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $306.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Attorney Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00

    Read MoreRead Less