This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 02/08/2021 at 04:18:00 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank, NA vs. Anna G Ihle

Case Summary

On 02/12/2019 Wells Fargo Bank, NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Anna G Ihle. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgeworth, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Edgeworth, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank, NA

Waddell Serafino Geary Rechner Jenevein, P.C., 1601 Elm Street, Suite 4100

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant

Ihle, Anna G

Anna, TX 75409-5082

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Whitney Abbott

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketRelease; Comments: Release of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketConference with Judge; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Orders Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketDeputy Reporter Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketMailed; Comments: Judgment Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketOrder for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Comments: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Defendant's First Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Return of Service- Ihle, Anna G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($306.00); Payor: Wells Fargo Bank, NA; Receipt: Receipt # DC-04051-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $306.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $313.00

    Read MoreRead Less