This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 08/11/2020 at 00:49:30 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank, NA Plaintiff, v. Diane E Nelson, Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 Wells Fargo Bank, NA Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Diane E Nelson, Defendant. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Roach, John R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Roach, John R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank, NA

Vincent Serafino Geary Waddell, Jenevein, P.C., 1601 Elm Street, Suite 4100

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant

Nelson, Diane E

Dallas, TX 75231

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Whitney Abbott

Defendant Attorney

John W Raggio

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketMailed; Comments: Judgment letter to Plaintiff's attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment Letter Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Last Known Address; Comments: Certificate of Last Known Address of Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment; Comments: Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Diane Nelson- Civil Citation- Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($306.00); Payor: Wells Fargo Bank, NA; Receipt: Receipt # DC-05408-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $306.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00

    Read MoreRead Less