This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 05/19/2020 at 00:07:14 (UTC).

Virginia Oaks Apartments vs. Vanessa Brown

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 Virginia Oaks Apartments filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Vanessa Brown. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0815

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Virginia Oaks Apartments

2520 W Virginia Pkwy

Mckinney, TX 75071

Defendant

Brown, Vanessa

Mckinney, TX 75071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketCounty Court at Law Letter; Comments: Appeal Dismissed back to JP1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketCounty Court at Law Letter; Comments: Case# 002-01945-2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketAppealed to CCL (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketCertification of Transcript; Judge: Raleeh, Paul M.; Comments: THE STATE OF TEXAS COUNTY OF COLLIN Raleeh, Paul M. JUSTICE COURT 1I hereby certify that the attached 19 pages are true and exact copies of the official court records for case number 01-EV-19-00815Witnessed my hand and official seal at the Court in McKinney, Collin County Texas06/19/2019By Any Alvarado Justice Court Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $301.00, Payments: $301.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($180.00); Payor: Virginia Oaks Apartments; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-003659-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $301.00, Payments: $301.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $180.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketBond Approved by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 1:30 PM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketRequest Rule 510.4c

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Possession of Property; Remedy Amount: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $301.00, Payments: $301.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Virginia Oaks Apartments; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-003081-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $301.00, Payments: $301.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Virginia Oaks Apartments is a litigant