This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 02/27/2020 at 14:21:42 (UTC).

Virgina Oaks Apartments vs. Jennifer Brown

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 Virgina Oaks Apartments filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Jennifer Brown. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0682

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Administration Building

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Virgina Oaks Apartments

2520 Virgina Pkwy

Mckinney, TX 75071

Defendant

Brown, Jennifer Denise

Mckinney, TX 75071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 1:30 PM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketRequest Rule 510.4c

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $121.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Virgina Oaks Apartments; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-002572-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Virginia Oaks Apartments is a litigant