This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/02/2020 at 14:23:42 (UTC).

Villas of Eldorado vs. Ashtonee Dugan

Case Summary

On 05/14/2019 Villas of Eldorado filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Ashtonee Dugan. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0790

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Villas of Eldorado

Mckinney, TX 75070

Defendant

Dugan, Ashtonee

Mckinney, TX 75070

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 1:30 PM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketRequest Rule 510.4c

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Possession of Property; Remedy Amount: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketMailed Notice to Plaintiff; Comments: Emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Villas of Eldorado; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-002997-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketEviction Suit; Comments: Guide and File - Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less