This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 03/01/2020 at 00:17:56 (UTC).

Vijayakumar Parasuraman vs. Robert Lamse

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 Vijayakumar Parasuraman filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Robert Lamse. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Missildine, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0115

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Missildine, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Parasuraman, Vijayakumar

Frisco, TX 75035

Defendant

Lamse, Robert James

Frisco, TX 75034

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketTrial by Judge; Time: 1:30 PM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketMailed Signed Dismissal to Each Side

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketNon-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketDismissal Order Signed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketMotion Filed; Comments: NOTICE OF NON-SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketMailed Notice of Trial to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketJudge's Docket Entry; Comments: Abate for 30 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketTrial by Judge; Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketMailed Notice of Trial to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketCitation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2019
  • DocketCitation Filed Small Claims; Comments: Denton County Constable Precinct 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $126.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($51.00); Payor: Parasuraman, Vijayakumar; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0002534-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less