Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 05/14/2020 at 01:01:49 (UTC).

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY vs. DOMINIC SALAZAR,XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DOMINIC SALAZAR,XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0405

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Administration Building

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Defendants

XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC.

C/O Brenda Guidroz, Registered Agent, 1900 Texas Ave.

Bridge City, TX 77611

SALAZAR, DOMINIC RAUMALDO

Dallas, TX 75232

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Dismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit; Comments: Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketRequest Rule 501.2e

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCitation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCitation Issued for Service To:; Comments: Private Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCitation Issued for Service To:; Comments: Private Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $51.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($51.00); Payor: USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-008110-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Petition; Comments: ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant