This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 10/25/2019 at 06:56:11 (UTC).

UCM/Michelson - The Vineyards LP dba The Vineyards Frisco vs. Raymond Wahl,Thomas Wilson

Case Summary

On 08/21/2019 UCM/Michelson - The Vineyards LP dba The Vineyards Frisco filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Raymond Wahl,Thomas Wilson. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike". The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1625

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UCM/Michelson - The Vineyards LP dba The Vineyards Frisco

9400 Wade Blvd

Frisco, TX 75035

Defendants

Wilson, Thomas

Frisco, TX 75035

Wahl, Raymond

Frisco, TX 75035

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketDismissed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketRule 510.4c Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketRequest Rule 510.4c

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation; Comments: SENT TO CON 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketPetition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($196.00); Payor: UCM/Michelson - The Vineyards LP dba The Vineyards Frisco; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-06450-JP4; Description: Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketDispositions-: Comments: Dismissed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $196.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UCM/Michelson - The Vineyards LP dba The Vineyards Frisco is a litigant