This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/02/2020 at 14:13:00 (UTC).

Tuscany at Wilson Creek vs. Mary Ann Recasner

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Tuscany at Wilson Creek filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Mary Ann Recasner. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0827

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tuscany at Wilson Creek

451 Wilson Creek Blvd.

Mckinney, TX 75069

Defendant

Recasner, Mary Ann

Mckinney, TX 75069

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $301.00, Payments: $301.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($180.00); Payor: Tuscany at Wilson Creek; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-003973-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $301.00, Payments: $301.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $180.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 1:30 PM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketRequest Rule 510.4c

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $121.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $301.00, Payments: $301.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Tuscany at Wilson Creek; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-003107-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $301.00, Payments: $301.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tuscany at Wilson Creek Apts is a litigant