This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 04/07/2021 at 17:26:06 (UTC).

Tuscany At Wilson Creek vs. Eric Jacobs,Addison Davis

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 Tuscany At Wilson Creek filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Eric Jacobs,Addison Davis. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0131

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Administration Building

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tuscany At Wilson Creek

451 Wilson Creek Boulevard, Ofc

Mckinney, TX 75069

Defendants

Jacobs, Eric Matthew

Mckinney, TX 75069

Davis, Addison Quinn

Mckinney, TX 75069

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Sheet; Comments: Jud for pltf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 1:30 PM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketRule 510.4c Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketRule 510.4c Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketRequest Rule 510.4c

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketRequest Rule 510.4c

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Possession of Property; Remedy Amount: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketE-Mailed Hearing Notice to Plaintiff; Comments: with zoom meeting id: 931 0482 9563

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($196.00); Payor: Tuscany At Wilson Creek; Receipt: Receipt # 2021-001146-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $196.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketAmended Petition; Comments: with apt #

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEviction Suit; Comments: Guide and File - Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tuscany at Wilson Creek Apts is a litigant