This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 12:25:10 (UTC).

Tuscany at Wilson Creek Apts vs. Tiffany Smith

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 Tuscany at Wilson Creek Apts filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Tiffany Smith. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0016

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Administration Building

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tuscany at Wilson Creek Apts

451 Wilson Creek Blvd

Mckinney, TX 75069-6421

Defendant

Smith, Tiffany

Mckinney, TX 75069-6421

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Sheet; Comments: Dis per Pltf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 1:30 PM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Eviction CDC Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketE-Mail Sent/Received; Comments: CDC declaration, Account Snapshot, statements, e-mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDefendant E-Mail Address Received; Comments: tiffanysmith2524@yahoo.com - emailed zoom link

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketRule 510.4c Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketRequest Rule 510.4c

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Tuscany at Wilson Creek Apts; Receipt: Receipt # 2021-000137-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketZoom Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketE-Mailed Hearing Notice to Plaintiff; Comments: with zoom meeting id

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketEviction Suit; Comments: Guide and File - Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Papers-: Person to Serve: Smith, Tiffany Type: FORCIBLE; Origin: Precinct 1; Paper No: C1-21-000046; Location: PCT 1 Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tuscany at Wilson Creek Apts is a litigant